LEGACY IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of social inclusion among people with disabilities, those with additional learning needs or who are in ill health who are socially excluded from society or parts of society: Raising public awareness, workshops, forums, advocacy and general support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £301,347 from 301347 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dustin Yemm | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christian Wilmot | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Chung | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £280.96k | £301.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £217.98k | £278.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £301.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL LEARNING NEEDS OR WHO ARE IN ILL-HEALTH WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF HAVING A DISABILITY, ADDITIONAL LEARNING NEEDS, OR ILL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: • RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, WITH ADDITIONAL LEARNING NEEDS, OR ILL-HEALTH, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION; AND • PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crownford House
Swan St
Merthyr Tydfil
CF47 8EU
- Phone:
- 07341435208
- Email:
- gareth@litc.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window