COSTUME AND TEXTILE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history and development of costumes and textiles and the history and development of the costume and textiles industries and trades in Norfolk and Norwich, in particular but not exclusively through: a) the provision of public events, talks, displays and activities which promote a greater understanding of the history and manufacture of costumes and te
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
Governance
- 31 January 2022: CIO registration
- 28 February 2023: Funds received from 1000730 THE COSTUME AND TEXTILE ASSOCIATION FOR NORFOLK MU...
- COSTUME AND TEXTILE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Whiting | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Warren | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Bailey | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Worth | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prudence Smith | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jackson | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Lacey | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Violet White | Trustee | 23 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA COE | Trustee | 01 March 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.81k | £33.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.48k | £25.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF COSTUMES AND TEXTILES AND THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE COSTUME AND TEXTILES INDUSTRIES AND TRADES IN NORFOLK AND NORWICH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EVENTS, TALKS, DISPLAYS AND ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE A GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORY AND MANUFACTURE OF COSTUMES AND TEXTILES IN GENERAL; B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO SUPPORT THE PRESENTATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE NORFOLK MUSEUMS SERVICE'S COSTUME AND TEXTILE COLLECTION; C) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; D) THE AWARD OF BURSARIES, PRIZES AND GRANTS TO SUPPORT STUDENTS OF TEXTILES AND FASHION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O SHIREHALL
MARKET AVENUE
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR1 3JQ
- Phone:
- 01603493625
- Email:
- ctacostume@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window