Trustees THE OUESSANT SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity number: 1195176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandra Mary Bell Chair 14 July 2021
None on record
Julie Penman Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Stephanie Jane Nice Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Anne Meredith Cruikshank Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Suzanne Edward Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Melanie Loder Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Paul Douglas Rose Trustee 29 October 2023
None on record
Anna Louise Kelly Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
John David Kelly Trustee 05 February 2023
None on record
Michelle Mcillmurray Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record