JORDAN SINNOTT FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jordan Sinnott Foundation Trust is a grant awarding Trust. We award grants via an on-line application form from our website to allow children and young adults who cannot afford to access sport and other recreational activities so as to enrich their lives through the sport they love.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Crooks | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES HUTTON | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Duncan | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Stead | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Crooks | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Morrell | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Bossons | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Lee | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sinnott | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Ward | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Lee | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Cookson | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Cookson | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.00k | £89.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.00k | £49.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, BY REASON OF SICKNESS OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO FUND ITEMS SUCH AS SPORTS EQUIPMENT, CLUB MEMBERSHIP OR TRAINING FACILITIES FOR THOSE WHO CANNOT AFFORD THEM. 3.1.2. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, BY MEANS OF SPORT AND HEALTHY RECREATION, TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES AND FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Park Road
BUXTON
Derbyshire
SK17 6SG
- Phone:
- 07596216846
- Email:
- info@js25.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window