CARY CARES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support residents and organisations local to the parishes of Castle Cary and Ansford through the provision of food, essentials and grants, both material and monetary, in order to offset financial hardship and emotional distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 02 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Baker | Chair | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Goodenough | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Shepherd | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Needle | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY ANN RYMER | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KNIGHT | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARK HUTTON | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY WOOLSTON | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MCKENZIE | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.05k | £12.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.03k | £15.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED ON 01 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF CASTLE CARY AND ANSFORD, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES, OR FACILITIES, CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS OR GROUPS, OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF SUCH PERSONS OR GROUPS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Victoria Park
CASTLE CARY
Somerset
BA7 7DG
- Phone:
- 07737283722
- Email:
- carycares1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window