THE BLACKHEATH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to preserve and enhance for the benefit of the public the features of Blackheath of particular beauty or historical and architectural interest; to protect its open spaces; to encourage high standards of planning and architecture in its new buildings; to promote improvements to the amenities of the area and to encourage appreciation of its character and history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 27 October 2021: CIO registration
- 04 October 2022: Funds received from 259843 THE BLACKHEATH SOCIETY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WATTS | Chair | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Barron | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Oliver | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ana Sutherland | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Patton | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth WRIGHT | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof John Bellhouse SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John WESTBROOK | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Howard John SHIELDS | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth MANSFIELD | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry Allan GRIFFIN | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Peers | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Dame Helen May REEVES | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Anna SUMMERS | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Roy BARTRAM | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £724.80k | £64.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.16k | £77.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £43.77k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £39.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £632.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £90.16k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PRESERVE AND ENHANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SUCH FEATURES OF BLACKHEATH AND ITS VICINITY AS ARE OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST, TO PROTECT FROM DISFIGUREMENT OR ENCROACHMENT ITS OPEN SPACES, PARTICULARLY THE HEATH, TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN ITS NEW BUILDINGS, AND GENERALLY TO PROMOTE INTEREST IN THE AMENITIES AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE DISTRICT, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS, TO MONITOR, PROTECT AND SEEK TO IMPROVE OR ENHANCE ITS ENVIRONMENT, SECURITY AND CHARACTER, INCLUDING ITS BUILT ENVIRONMENT, ITS TRANSPORT AND LICENSING REGIMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Bakehouse
11 Blackheath Village
Blackheath
London
SE3 9LA
- Phone:
- 02082971937
- Email:
- office@blackheath.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window