AL-WAFFAA MADRASAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity involves itself in the activities listed below: - Qur'an and Islamic studies - community and counseling for families - Help with household essential support when possible etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Tanzania
Governance
- 22 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SULEIMAN MBARAK SALIM | Chair | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
FAHAD SAID | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Najih Muadhin | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Habidat Alidou | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAMIHA SAEED SULEYMAN OMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
FAIZAH KHAMIS MOHAMMED | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
NABIL MUSAH | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMINA JUMA ALI | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KHAYRAT JUMA ALI | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAMHA SAEED SULEYMAN OMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £449 | £3.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232 | £1.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
1/ TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUTH AND YOUNG ADULTS MAINLY, THROUGH PROVIDING GRANTS FOR BUYING SCHOOL UNIFORMS, BOOKS & LEARNING MATERIALS, EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIVITIES IN ENGLISH, MATHEMATICS & SCIENCES. 2/ TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN ENGLAND, WALES AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MADRASAH(S), A PLACE OF WORSHIP (MASJID(S)) AND TO PROVIDE PASTORAL CARE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND OVERSEAS. 3/ TO ASSIST IN THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY WHERE AND WHEN REQUIRED IN ENGLAND, WALES AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ADVICE, GRANTS AND ITEMS SUCH AS FOOD, WATER, CLOTHING AND OTHER NECESSITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARKING MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE
3 THE TRIANGLE
TANNER STREET
BARKING
IG11 8QA
- Phone:
- 07488551931
- Email:
- alwaffaamadrasah3@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window