THE FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ALBERT MEMORIAL MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of knowledge and access to knowledge via talks, visits and publications, in particular in relation to the collections and activities of the Royal Albert Memorial Museum (RAMM) and Devon. Supporting RAMM through the financing of acquisitions, conservation and exhibitions, and by advocacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 03 December 2021: CIO registration
- 09 November 2023: Funds received from 306649 FRIENDS OF EXETER MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERY TRUST
- THE FRIENDS OF RAMM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Duncan Pocock | Chair | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Veronica Mathieson | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nelson | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Hampton | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew John McKeon | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ALAN DAVID CAIG | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Yvonne Wells Professor | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grisilda Susan Harrison | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marianne Honeyball | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Ann Hawkins | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.16k | £21.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £13.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING, ASSISTING AND IMPROVING THE ROYAL ALBERT MEMORIAL MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY EXETER, THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS WHICH WILL: A) SUPPORT PRESERVATION, PRESENTATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE COLLECTIONS OF SAID ORGANISATION IN CO-OPERATION WITH THEIR MANAGEMENT, STAFF AND TRUSTEES; B) PROMOTE AWARENESS OF AND STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE ARTS, HISTORY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE WITHIN EXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH A PROGRAMME OF EVENTS, VISITS, TALKS AND ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL ALBERT MEMORIAL MUSEUM
QUEEN STREET
EXETER
EX4 3RX
- Phone:
- 01392265858
- Email:
- friends@exeter.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window