RAISING YOUTH CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising Youth provides support services to individuals aged 0-19 (and those aged 20-25 with Special Educational Needs and Disabilities (SEND) or Mental Health Conditions) living and/or working in Kent and Medway. Our services cover topics such as Mental Health, Growth & Development, Sexual Health, Employment, Advice & Guidance & Signposting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £9,484 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 19 October 2021: CIO registration
- RAISING YOUTH CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Chalk | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy-Rose Mia Stevens | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Jordan | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Akiode | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Callum Fred Alan Thomas | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.51k | £0 | £12.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46k | £132 | £7.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £9.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Oct 2021 as amended on 03 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 DIAGNOSED WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS (SEN) OR MENTAL HEALTH (MH) DIFFICULTIES LIVING IN SOUTH EAST ENGLAND BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A. ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B. ADVANCING EDUCATION; C. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; D. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH FREE STAY AND PLAY GROUPS AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT AND ADVICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Raising Youth
St Nicholas Church
Strood
Kent
ME2 4TR
- Phone:
- 07903560200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window