GRACE CHURCH HAMMERSMITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grace Church Hammersmith currently worships on Sunday mornings at the Irish Cultural Centre in Hammersmith. In the evenings, we typically worship at the West London Free School Sixth Form in Hammersmith. We meet on Wednesday evenings for bible study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 15 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Arthur Clark | Chair | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomas Cradock | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pau Ping Sze To | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Rudolph Ilderton | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Frank Hilary Linnell | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.15k | £26.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.04k | £27.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUBORDINATE STANDARD OF FAITH AS DEFINED IN THE BOOK OF CHURCH ORDER OF THE INTERNATIONAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (BCO) APPLICABLE TO THE CONGREGATION IN HAMMERSMITH, WEST LONDON AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE BCO WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
162 BAGLEYS LANE
LONDON
SW6 2FW
- Phone:
- 07873495230
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window