LANESBOROUGH PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to advance the education of pupils in the RGS Prep School, Guildford, in particular by (i) developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; and (ii) engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saisathyeswari Mosur | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faraz Fazeli | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Charlotte Mckeown Rist | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Muir | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.95k | £42.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.73k | £29.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RGS Prep School
MAORI ROAD
GUILDFORD
SURREY
GU1 2EL
- Phone:
- 01483880650
- Email:
- rgsp-psecretary@rgsg.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window