SILTH'S SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Silth's Sanctuary rescues, rehabilitates, and rehomes or returns abandoned, stray, and feral animals, particularly cats. We are run by volunteers and operate through a series of foster homes. We mostly operate within the central Liverpool region, but rehome nation wide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 21 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rudy Arthur | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elara Nicholson | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhana Nicholson | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Walton | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arwen Nicholson | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.16k | £21.97k | £22.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.48k | £18.40k | £21.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF ANIMAL SUFFERING BY PROVIDING FOOD, SHELTER, AND MEDICAL CARE WITH A FOCUS ON ABANDONED, FERAL, AND SICK ANIMALS AND AN AIM TO REHOME WHEREVER POSSIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 KEW ROAD
FORMBY
LIVERPOOL
L37 2HB
- Phone:
- 07858149683
- Email:
- silthssanctuary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window