Accounts and annual returns THE NATASHA LEWIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1196995
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 August 2024 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 06 August 2024 98 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 31 July 2024 458 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 31 July 2024 458 days late Download Open in new window