Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH, STOCKTON ON TEES
Charity number: 1195893

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Arnold | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rosser Rollinson | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Ben Ameh | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Catherine Errington | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ursula Williams | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gordon Eyles | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Collins | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY FRANCES AITHWAITE | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Faye Ellen Thompson | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.