SIMON SAYS CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE'S BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Simon Says supports children and young people in Hampshire when an important person in their life has died or is dying. This includes: - telephone support - monthly support groups across the county - written information and resources - support to schools and other professionals Simon Says were first registered as an unincorporated charity (no 1088746) in 2001 and became a CIO on 1/11/21
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 01 November 2021: CIO registration
- 07 February 2023: Funds received from 1088746 SIMON SAYS
- SIMON SAYS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dave Smith | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Jennings | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Bateman | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Hearsey | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Stanley | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Williams | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sue Gadd | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Berrett | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.71k | £214.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.12k | £158.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, BY THE SUPPORT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE ABOUT TO SUFFER A BEREAVEMENT; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH IN RELATION TO THE EFFECTS OF CHILDHOOD BEREAVEMENT AND INTO METHODS OF SUPPORTING BEREAVED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THOSE EFFECTS AND METHODS. THE CIO SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Old Carthouses
Broadlands Park
ROMSEY
Hampshire
SO51 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01794323934
- Email:
- info@simonsays.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window