GAMERS BEAT CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gamers Beat Cancer is a registered UK based charity in England & Wales We support people of all ages, all backgrounds, and all types of cancer to manage the mental health issues that come with living with cancer, and the emotional trauma that accompanies cancer diagnoses, prognosis, and treatment. We also look to support caregivers and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 March 2022: CIO registration
- GAMERS BEAT CANCER CIC (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Bracewell | Chair | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Wright | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Joseph Berry | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.49k | £18.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.78k | £30.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING WITH CANCER, THEIR CAREGIVERS AND CARE FACILITIES BY THE PROVISION OF TECHNOLOGY, GAMING EQUIPMENT AND GAMES FREE OF CHARGE, DURING AND AFTER TREATMENT WHILST IN HOSPITAL OR RECOVERING AT HOME OR IN A HOSPICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Albany Street
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX3 9JE
- Phone:
- 07598993082
- Email:
- info@gamersbeatcancer.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window