COBRIDGE COMMUNITY MULTI CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cobridge Community Multicultural Association (CCMA) serve it`s community by recognising the social, welfare and education needs within Stoke and the West Midlands. We also provide a range of activities to support the elderly, BMEs and young people in our local community; Luncheon Club, Keep Fit for the elderly, Carnival & Salsa Dance, Caribbean cooking classes and a range of training course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 19 January 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert Scott | Chair | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLEO ROBINSON | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE FALCONER | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Fowler | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEADMAN THAW | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR Chinn Harvey | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alphonso Parnell | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lloyd | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE SAVAGE | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ERROL THOMAS | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA JOHNS | Trustee | 21 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLARICE MCCLAUSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN ANN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD JONES JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.70k | £26.05k | £34.51k | £30.90k | £25.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.91k | £19.54k | £27.98k | £35.74k | £27.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 1984, AS AMENDED 24TH AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE CITY OF STOKE-ON-TRENT AND THE BOROUGH OF NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OROF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH AND LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY ON THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CCMA BUILDING
353 COBRIDGE ROAD
HANLEY
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 5JP
- Phone:
- 01782262609
- Email:
- info@geens.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window