RETIRED GREYHOUNDS CHARITY - WHITTINGHAM KENNELS GREYHOUND CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving the distress of greyhounds and other sighthounds by providing: a centre and related services for the care and rehoming of retired racing greyhounds and other sighthounds. Providing a safe haven for the dogs until a loving home is found. Providing information to the public about understanding the needs of greyhounds and other sighthounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 November 2021: CIO registration
- WHITTINGHAM KENNELS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Jeffrey | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Fidgeon MSc | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Stokes PhD | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Kyriakou | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Clark BA, MA | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.53k | £296.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.86k | £119.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS THE GREYHOUND AND SIGHTHOUND BREED BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, REHOMING, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR THOSE BREEDS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CLAVERHAMBURY KENNELS
WHITTINGHAM KENNELS
GALLEY HILL
WALTHAM ABBEY
EN9 2BL
- Phone:
- 01992893734
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.