AZAYLIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Azaylia Foundation was created to support UK-based children fighting cancer by helping them access treatment abroad not readily available from the NHS, while at the same time working with cancer research and medical institutions to accelerate the availability of new treatments in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anindita Roy | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francis Mussai | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Safiyya Vorajee | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Thomas Cain | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81m | £215.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £907.80k | £364.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.81m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £454.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £453.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £301.90k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF NEED OF CHILDREN AFFECTED BY CANCER, AND THEIR FAMILIES OR CARERS, BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 02071014586
- Email:
- info@azaylia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window