BISHOPS' HANDBELL RINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HANDBELL TUNE RINGING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 24 March 1987: Standard registration
- BISHOPS HANDBELL RINGERS (Working name)
- BLACON HANDBELL RINGERS (Previous name)
- BLACON HIGH SCHOOL HANDBELL RINGERS (Previous name)
- CHESTER HANDBELL RINGERS (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WALSH | Chair | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barry Marshall Ingram | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER MARGARET JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.18k | £0 | £169 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 August 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/01/1987 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2014
Charitable objects
(A) THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF HANDBELL RINGING IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES; (B) TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL, FROM TIME TO TIME, DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 THACKERAY DRIVE
VICARS CROSS
CHESTER
CH3 5LP
- Phone:
- 01244350293
- Email:
- dnj@malvern61.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window