OLD STUDENTS ASSOCIATION OF J/CANAGARATNAM MADHYA MAHA VIDYALAYAM - UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1196691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the students at Canagaratnam Madhya Maha Vidyalayam (CMMV) by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the College To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardsh

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,670
Total expenditure: £1,863

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Sri Lanka

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ponnuthurai Thavanathan Chair 19 November 2021
None on record
THARMALINGAM THIRUNAVUKARASU Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Jegasothy Kanagalingam Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Thamotharampillai Thijagaseelan Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Arunasalam Manoharan Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.15k £1.67k
Total expenditure £5.47k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 August 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 January 2025 338 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
115 CAMBRIDGE ROAD
HARROW
HA2 7LB
Phone:
07440519704
Website:

No information available