RIDLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1196428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a Christian Organisation, we do religious activities Provide Services to the Community We help Children/young People, Elderly/old People, The General Public/mankind We operate in Newham

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £30,028
Total expenditure: £32,373

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Graham Parrington Chair 05 November 2021
None on record
ALEXANDER ALAN CRAIG Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
Alastair George McCall Steven Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
MARTIN ORIAKHI Trustee 05 November 2021
KINGDOM GOSPEL CHURCH
Received: On time
Kenneth Gordon Brownell Trustee 05 November 2021
CHRISTIAN HERITAGE LONDON
Received: On time
Equipping Pastors Worldwide Ltd
Received: On time
LIVING LEADERSHIP MINISTRIES
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £70.30k £30.03k
Total expenditure £52.70k £32.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 January 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 January 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
94 Upton Lane
Forest Gate
London
E7 9LW
Phone:
07512225636