DOCTORS' SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Doctors' Support Network (DSN) Is a confidential peer support network for UK based doctors and medical students with concerns about our own mental health. We aim to raise awareness, reduce stigma and influence the agenda regarding physician health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 October 2021: CIO registration
- 30 May 2024: Funds received from 1103741 DOCTORS' SUPPORT NETWORK
- DSN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Angelika Luehrs | Chair | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kaman Hansford | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Kinnear | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Atcheson | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clive Morgan | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ross John Freeman | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Louise Freeman | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Jenny Holmes | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Christie | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £497 | £17.33k | £2.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27k | £20.49k | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND OTHERS IN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS OR OTHER DISTRESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF SELF HELP GROUPS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES WITHIN THE MEDICAL PROFESSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 1 De Merley Road
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE61 1HZ
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Email:
- info@dsn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window