BAICE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arrange and provide for meetings and conferences on subjects of general and special interest in the field of Comparative and International Education, stimulate knowledge and research, provide for the publication of COMPARE Journal, as well as dissemination in the area of Comparative and International Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 May 2022: Standard registration
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR INTERNATIONAL AND COMPARATIVE EDUCATION (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alison Sarah Hemmings-Buckler | Chair | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Surya Pratap Deka | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Jomafuvwe Agbaire | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anesa Hosein | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ricardo Sabates Aysa | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR THUSHARI WELIKALA | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jingyi Li | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Andrew Turner | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor NAMRATA RAO | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.64k | £120.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.48k | £87.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF COMPARATIVE AND INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE TO: 4.1 ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR MEETINGS AND CONFERENCES ON SUBJECTS OF GENERAL AND SPECIAL INTEREST IN THE FIELD OF COMPARATIVE AND INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION; 4.2 STIMULATE KNOWLEDGE AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF COMPARATIVE AND INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION THROUGH CROSS-DISCIPLINARY STUDIES, THE DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH RESULTS, THE FORMATION OF NETWORKS, AND SUPPORT FOR TRAINING SCHEMES; 4.3 PROVIDE FOR THE PUBLICATION OF THE JOURNAL COMPARE: A JOURNAL OF COMPARATIVE AND INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION, WHICH ENHANCES KNOWLEDGE IN THE SUBJECT; AND 4.4 PROVIDE FOR THE PUBLICATION OF OTHER JOURNALS, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, AND RESEARCH REPORTS IN THE FIELD OF COMPARATIVE AND INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Rosemary Avenue
Earley
READING
RG6 5YQ
- Phone:
- 07470266135
- Email:
- secretary@baice.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window