HONG KONG PEOPLE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the Charity are: 1.1. To relieve the needs of nationals from Hong Kong who are living in the U.K (temporarily or permanently) by the provision of: 1.1.1. advancing education and training so as to advance them in life and to assist them to adapt within a new community. 1.1.2. relieving financial hardship for those in need of such by providing advice and guidance on welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kin Ming Je | Chair | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF NATIONALS FROM HONG KONG WHO ARE LIVING IN THE U.K (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) BY THE PROVISION OF: 3.1.1. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND TO ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 3.1.2. RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THOSE IN NEED OF SUCH BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE ON WELFARE BENEFITS AND HOUSING. 3.1.3. FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS RESETTLING WITHIN THE U.K AND WHO HAVE A NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR ASYLUM OR REFUGEE STATUS. 3.1.4. RELIEVING POOR HEALTH AND SICKNESS AMONG THOSE GRANTED OR SEEKING ASYLUM OR REFUGEE STATUS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT ON ACCESSING THE U.K HEALTH CARE SYSTEM (NHS). 3.1.5. RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THOSE IN NEED OF SUCH SUPPORT BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, SKILLS TRAINING, AND ADVICE ON THE U.K JOB MARKET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hong Kong People Association
Ground Floor
1-2 Craven Road
London
- Phone:
- 07512726895
- Email:
- info@hkpeople.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window