Financial history THE WEST MIDLANDS EXAMINATIONS BOARD

Charity number: 518419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £5.88k £1.07k £5.20k £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.00k £3.80k £4.00k £4 £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A