THE WEST MIDLANDS EXAMINATIONS BOARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Spencer Clark | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Lyndsay McPhee | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.88k | £1.07k | £5.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £3.80k | £4.00k | £4 | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 DECEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 DECEMBER 1986, 19 MARCH 1991,17 MARCH 1992 AND 11 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING, SUPPORTING AND MAINTAINING A REGIONAL EXAMINATIONS BOARD THROUGHOUT THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION.
Area of benefit
THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TRIANGLE BUILDING
SHAFTESBURY ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8EA
- Phone:
- 01223 553311
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window