Governing document THE WEST MIDLANDS EXAMINATIONS BOARD
Charity number: 518419

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 DECEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 DECEMBER 1986, 19 MARCH 1991,17 MARCH 1992 AND 11 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING, SUPPORTING AND MAINTAINING A REGIONAL EXAMINATIONS BOARD THROUGHOUT THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.