PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 January 1987: Standard registration
- 09 October 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 FEBRUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PENDLE WHETHER THEY BE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OR NOT, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF ASIAN ORIGIN, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY: (1) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION CONCERNING GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN A MULIT-RACIAL MULTI-CULTURAL AND MULTI-FAITH SOCIETY AND PROMOTING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN SUCH PERSONS.(2) RELIEVING SUCH PERSONS, PRIMARILY THOSE OF ASIAN ORIGIN, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND INFORMATION SUPPORT SERVICE DEALING WITH MATTERS OF WELFARE RIGHTS AND BENEFITS, HOUSING EMPLOYMENT AND LEGAL AND OTHER PROBLEMS INCLUDING THOSE ENCOUNTERES AS A RESULT OF AN INADEQUATE OCMMAND OF THEENGLISH LANGUAGE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF PENDLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window