TINSLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our centre is available for various events,: Over 60's club, keep fit groups, elderly lunch club, youth club, bingo night etc. Mainly for Tinsley residents and their friends. Also various community meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 January 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLORIA FREEMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Graham Whitfield | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN HOLLOWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHELIA LOWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS DOT BRAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £388 | £2.45k | £525 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.32k | £4.85k | £2.31k | £560 | £515 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 335 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 October 2021 | 499 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITCAL, RELIGIOUS, RACE OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTOTY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
TINSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tinsley Community Centre
1b Ingfield Avenue
Sheffield
S9 1WZ
- Phone:
- 01142426234
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window