MARSDEN MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation for older poeple who are in need and who live in the Bradford and Harrogate area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 06 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
54 North Homes Limited | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.29k | £37.32k | £37.08k | £41.95k | £45.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.24k | £28.91k | £41.16k | £105.04k | £18.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09/10/1986 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 05/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS IN NEED. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY OF ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 North Homes Limited
3rd Floor
White Rose House
8 Otley Road
LEEDS
- Phone:
- 01132783335
- Email:
- finance@lyha.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window