Accounts and annual returns MIND HEALTH FOR MEDICAL STUDENTS

Charity number: 1196846
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2023 16 July 2024 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 16 July 2024 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 August 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 25 June 2023 24 days late Download Open in new window