THE ELEVATION CHURCH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's Object which is to be carried out for the public benefit is the advancement of the Christian faith worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oluwatosin Abosede Babalola | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abraham Ayodele Oni | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Opeolu Owotomo Awolesi | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.24k | £456.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.51k | £377.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT (“THE OBJECT”) WHICH IS TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE THROUGH (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH):- THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SAME; BROADCASTING FAITH BASED MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE ACROSS OUR COMMUNITIES IN THE UK. THIS ALSO INCLUDES COMMUNITY OUTREACH THAT IS BENEFICIAL TO THE SOCIAL WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITIES THAT WE SERVE; AND 6.1.3 HOLDING EVENTS, CREATING AND CIRCULATING RESOURCES AIMED AT EMPOWERING THE GENERAL BODY OF CHRIST AND SUPPORT OTHER CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES WITH DEDICATED RESOURCES FOR MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES. THE OBJECT IS TO BE CARRIED OUT AS A PROCLAMATION OF THE BELIEFS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 8 BELOW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crown House
27 Old Gloucester Street
London
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 07880907093
- Email:
- info@elevationuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window