THE BURWARTON AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ORGANISATION OF ANNUAL EVENT FOR EXHIBITION OF LIVESTOCK, FARM AND HORTICULTURAL PRODUCE AND FOR THE DEMONSTRATION / EXHIBITION OF AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL AND FORESTRY METHODS AND PROCESSES, MACHINERY AND OTHER ITEMS CONSIDERED TO BE APPROPRIATE TO AN AGRICULTURAL SHOW. AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING, ENCOURAGEMENT OF YOUNG FARMERS AND OF INDUSTRIES OF INTEREST TO THE FARMING COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
Governance
- 09 February 1987: Standard registration
- THE BURWARTON SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN GEOFFREY WATKINS | Chair | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Clack | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.03k | £33.52k | £49.26k | £319.35k | £312.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.37k | £59.74k | £51.74k | £305.68k | £313.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £25.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND FOR PROMOTING THE GENERAL GOOD OF THE SAME, PARTICULARY IN BURWATON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN SO FAR AS SUCH OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BURWARTON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SHOW OFFICE
BURWARTON
BRIDGNORTH
SHROPSHIRE
WV16 6QJ
- Phone:
- 01746787535
- Email:
- info@burwartonshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window