FAHR BEYOND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect the health of patients with Fahrs Disease and allied conditions. Provide assistance to people with Fahrs and/or their families, dependents, and other persons affected by Fahrs Promote, support, and disseminate research into the causes, prevention, treatment and cure of Fahrs Advance the education of the public (including medical professionals) about Fahrs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam John Tate | Chair | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francesca Magrinelli | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Diane Miller | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Catharine Tate | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr CARINA JACQUELINE FEARNLEY | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.48k | £2.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.49k | £5.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS WITH THE CONDITION KNOWN AS FAHR'S DISEASE AND ALLIED CONDITIONS (REFERRED TO HERE AS FAHR'S), BY: A. PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO PEOPLE WITH FAHR'S AND/OR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDENTS, FRIENDS AND CARERS AND OTHER PERSONS AFFECTED BY FAHR'S; B. PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF FAHR'S AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; C. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS) ON ISSUES RELATING TO FAHR'S.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 BRENTINGBY CLOSE
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE13 1ES
- Phone:
- 0
- Email:
- enquiries@fahrbeyond.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window