WAT THAI BRIGHTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering classes on the teachings of the Buddha and meditation practice at Wat Thai Brighton or at residential. The monks welcome and support any member of the public who are interested in teachings of Lord Buddha which can be applied in daily life. The monks offer general spiritual support and guidance as well as funerals etc. We also have Thai and Buddhist cultural events open to public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nantana Mears | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kesorn Stevens | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Elliott | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Warman | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Venerable Khammuean Niwatchai | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Venerable Aren Alexander | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.50k | £48.67k | £48.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.26k | £51.22k | £47.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THERAVADA BUDDHISM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND AND BEYOND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. ESTABLISHING A PERMANENT TEMPLE WHERE THE DHAMMA CAN BE STUDIED AND TAUGHT AND WHERE MEDITATION CAN BE PRACTICED; B. PROVIDING SUPPORT TO BUDDHIST MONKS AND NUNS IN THEIR STUDIES AND PASTORAL DUTIES; C. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wat Thai Brighton
22 Gableson Avenue
BRIGHTON
BN1 5FG
- Phone:
- 07538384333
- Website:
-
Watthaibrighton.Org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window