DONCASTER ROTHERHAM AND DISTRICT MOTOR TRADES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education and training to assist learners in progression towards or gaining vocational qualifications to prepare, assist or enable them to be employed or engaged in a career connected to the motor vehicle repair industry or road transport industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£1,446,843
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.34m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £108.54k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,561,990
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.56m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £892,514 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.56m |
People

26 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 1987: Standard registration
- G T A (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY MICHAEL THOMPSON FIMI C ENG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lee Wright | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Annette Scott | Trustee | 01 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID WAINWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER MATTHEW COGGON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY CHARLES HARMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40m | £1.37m | £1.34m | £1.37m | £1.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50m | £1.44m | £1.35m | £1.43m | £1.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £921.14k | £922.99k | £854.98k | £829.93k | £892.51k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.39m | £1.34m | £1.33m | £1.37m | £1.34m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.63k | £15.78k | £5.62k | £1.28k | £108.54k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £17.18k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.50m | £1.44m | £1.35m | £1.43m | £1.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.79k | £22.19k | £21.51k | £23.15k | £10.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.40m | £3.51m | £3.45m | £3.60m | £3.57m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £100 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Other assets | £2.22m | £2.08m | £2.08m | £1.88m | £1.78m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £80.59k | £128.06k | £70.46k | £70.70k | £64.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 January 2021 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 17 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FURTHER AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF INDUSTRIAL TRAINING IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE INDUSTRIAL TRAINING ACT 1982 FOR PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN ROAD TRANSPORT ACTIVITIES AS DEFINED BY THE INDUSTRIAL TRAINING (ROAD TRANSPORT BOARD) ORDER 1982 OR SUCH OTHER PERSONS EMPLOYED AND INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MAY BENEFIT FROM THE TRAINING SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND GENERALLY SUPERVISE AND FURTHER THE INDUSTRIAL TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DONCASTER MOTOR TRADES GTA LTD
UNIT 1 RANDS LANE INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
RANDS LANE
ARMTHORPE
DONCASTER
DN3 3DY
- Phone:
- 01302832831
- Email:
- admin@doncastergta.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window