KIDS CLOTHES 4 ALL

Charity Number: 1198266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Kids Clothes 4 All's mission is to supply children in the Sutton Borough and local area with a season's worth of pre-loved clothes, to assist in a small way and to promote them to live their best life.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5
Total expenditure: £477

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarai Carson Chair 15 March 2022
None on record
JOSIE ANNA RUFFLE Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Anne-Noreen Keddy Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Oliver Carson Trustee 15 March 2022
None on record
Divya Susan Davies Trustee 05 March 2022
None on record
Rene Mears Trustee 05 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.49k £5
Total expenditure £399 £477
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
260 LONGFELLOW ROAD
WORCESTER PARK
KT4 8AT
Phone:
07771930069