THE LITTLE THEATRE DONNINGTON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Dramatic and Operatic Society at present performing five annual shows. Shows include pantomimes, plays, musicals and concert style shows (operatic/musicals).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 17 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Oliver-Davies | Chair | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Cassells | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annika Rose Dixon | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Kendal | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki-Louise Stevens | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dale Pritchard | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Bishop | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Robertson | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.45k | £31.46k | £23.29k | £30.55k | £30.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.30k | £12.31k | £31.26k | £30.42k | £30.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.80k | £8.00k | £1.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN MUSIC AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Theatre Donnington
Wellington Road
Donnington
Telford
TF2 8AW
- Phone:
- 07971993802
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window