COLEG Y BEDYDDWYR CAERDYDD / CARDIFF BAPTIST COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Religion in accordance with the beliefs and practices of Baptists and the interpretation of such beliefs and practices and in particular the training of students for ministry amongst the Baptist churches. To provide education, training, vocational preparation and support to Christians for mission and ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 20 April 2022: CIO registration
- SOUTH WALES BAPTIST COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Louise Butt | Chair | 31 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev TIMOTHY IAN MOODY | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev EDWARD NOBLE KANEEN | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Emma Elizabeth Franks | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
CEDRIC GREGORY LONGVILLE | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Caren Maree Fullerton | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Denzil leuan John | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF BAPTISTS AND THE INTERPRETATION OF SUCH BELIEFS AND PRACTICES AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE TRAINING OF STUDENTS FOR MINISTRY AMONGST THE BAPTIST CHURCHES, AND 2) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING, VOCATIONAL PREPARATION AND SUPPORT FOR CHRISTIANS FOR MISSION AND MINISTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLEG Y BEDYDDWYR CAERDYDD
CARDIFF BAPTIST COLLEGE
54 RICHMOND ROAD
CARDIFF
CF24 3UR
- Phone:
- 02920256066
- Email:
- admin@cbc.cymru
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window