Accounts and annual returns Crowthorne & Wokingham Without NMI Men's Shed

Charity number: 1195509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 April 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 April 2024 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 April 2024 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 April 2024 434 days late Download Open in new window