CYLCH MEITHRIN CARNO A TI A FI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Carno provides sessional care through the medium of Welsh at Canolfan Cymdeithasol Carno Community Centre, Carno, Powys. Our aim is to provide a secure, safe and happy playgroup setting for all the children and give them the best possible start to their education through a variety of stimulating activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £4,902 from 1 government contract(s) and £5,289 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 10 January 2022: CIO registration
- CARNO CYLCH MEITHRIN A TI A FI (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALICE ANN JONES | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Moore | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Ceri Jerman-Jones | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siwan Elizabeth Humphreys | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Gwendolen Thomas | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA JONES | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £21.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.06k | £17.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.64k | £4.90k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.93k | £5.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN THE VILLAGE OF CARNO AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canolfan Gymunedol Carno
Carno
Caersws
SY17 5LH
- Phone:
- 07943832082
- Email:
- cylchcarno@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window