GODS GENERALS MISSION OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a charity and a religious organisation, we preach the gospel to individuals, organizations and communities. we use various mediums such as internet, social media, word to mouth and other charitable activities such as donations to the less privileged in society.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 August 2021: Standard registration
- GENERALS EMBASSY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MORRIS SETSOAFIA KONADU | Chair | 15 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
BEATRICE ADA EWANE | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL AKINMUSERE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD AFARI KORANTENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIGHT KINIMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 709 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
“THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, BIBLE STUDY, CONDUCTING RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES AND TO PROVIDE OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE FOR THE COMMUNITY.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 SMEETON GARDENS
MILFORD STREET
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 3DY
- Phone:
- 07311480668
- Email:
- UK.GGMO@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window