RBKARES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RBKares connects kindness and generosity in the Kingston community with vulnerable people and key-workers. We focus on providing support to NHS staff, care homes and other vulnerable groups eg: refugees and the homeless. We use the community's sewing and crafting skills to make items to support people in our community, run sewing workshops and wellbeing days empowering people to help themselves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £6,700 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Beatrix Kate Margot Kenyon | Chair | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Gibson | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Watson | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Coe | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Claire Green | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.79k | £32.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.92k | £19.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.36k | £6.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES, ITEMS AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST ELDERLY AND VULNERABLE PEOPLE IN ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND SURROUNDINGS IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, ITEMS AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY DOCTORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Norbiton Avenue
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT1 3QR
- Phone:
- 07811053877
- Email:
- info@rbkares.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window