BROTTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities include: Bingo 3 times per week Dog club once per week Spiritual evening once per week Fitness hour twice a week Tea dance once every two weeks Childrens parties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 20 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Cutler | Chair | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Frelich | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jane Parker | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Yeoman | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE KATHLEEN WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.37k | £11.67k | £12.30k | £13.32k | £19.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.62k | £8.95k | £12.60k | £18.01k | £23.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 9 JANUARY 1987
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF BROTTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OF OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BROTTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brotton Village Hall
Laburnum Road
Brotton
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
TS12 2SE
- Phone:
- 01287679968
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window