WEAVERHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide sport and leisure to the community of Weaverham and surrounding isolated communites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Total income includes £24,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 18 May 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN JEREMY COLLIER FREEMAN | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Gillian Edwards | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||||||
NIALL PHILIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.09k | £55.33k | £59.74k | £64.56k | £74.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.19k | £57.01k | £58.86k | £43.78k | £49.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 649 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 649 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 September 2024 | 768 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2021
(These accounts |
05 September 2024 | 768 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 June 2024 | 1055 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 20 June 2024 | 1056 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 October 2021 | 442 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 October 2021 | 442 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEAVERHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEXOR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO ECURE THE ESTABLISMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO AMINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATIONAND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIESIN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WEAVERHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEAVERHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Weaverham Community Centre
Russet Road
Weaverham
NORTHWICH
CW8 3HY
- Phone:
- 01606854088
- Email:
- weaverhamcentre@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window