WREKENTON NOU CAMP YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wreketon Nou Camp is a grassroots sports club offering the young people in the community an opportunity to engage in football and fitness in a safe and encouraging environment. The club is a FA charter Standard Community club inviting young people of all abilities to participate from the age of 4 to 18 with the strategic plan to open up our services to everyone in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £89,313 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
Governance
- 27 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ronald james Burge | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Pegg | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Bowman | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Ball | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.39k | £89.51k | £144.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.20k | £45.60k | £55.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.01k | £89.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN NETHERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wrekenton Nou Camp YFC
CAMPGROUND W T S
SPRINGWELL ROAD
WREKENTON
GATESHEAD
NE9 7XW
- Phone:
- 07966830551
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window