Trustees FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER
Charity number: 1195675

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen O'Brien | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Emery | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gregory | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Duffy | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Champness | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Louise Nolan | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Williams | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Dorothy Tooley | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Charlton-Weedy | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Stocks | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gwynne Wright | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.