CHILDREN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children' Aid are an international humanitarian and poverty relief charity delivering support and relief services to children in the UK and overseas. We work across a number of areas delivering food aid, water aid, medical aid, shelter, education and disaster relief services wherever they are needed most.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- India
- Kenya
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- South Africa
Governance
- 01 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nadeem Mian | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kashef Ahmed | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Sattar | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Khan | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.02k | £117.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.54k | £81.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY THOSE IN POOR AND DISADVANTAGED CIRCUMSTANCES, THOSE SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY AND INCAPACITY OF ANY KIND AND THOSE WHO ARE DEPRIVED REGARDLESS OF THEIR GENDER, ABILITY OR DISABILITY, RELIGION, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGINS IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE, EITHER DIRECTLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES AND/OR THROUGH CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OVERSEAS WHO ARE DISPLACED OR LIVING IN DESOLATION AND/OR IMPOVERISHED CIRCUMSTANCES AND TO SUPPORT AND ADVANCE THE WELLBEING, EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GRANTS ITEMS OR SERVICES FOR PERSONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE, SHELTER AND MEDICAL AID
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 COUNCILLOR LANE
CHEADLE
STOCKPORT
SK8 2HU
- Phone:
- 08450095003
- Email:
- info@childrensaid.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window