MINEHEAD DEMENTIA ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims: To support people with memory loss and their carers in the Minehead area. To maintain community involvement by providing a range of activities. To raise awareness of dementia by working with local businesses, organisations and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 26 November 2021: CIO registration
- Minehead Dementia Action (Working name)
- MINEHEAD DEMENTIA ACTION ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily J Feldberg | Chair | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lehegarat | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Wilcox | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Kim Berkhauer | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Della Paine | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mew | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank David Talling | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £18.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.11k | £7.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Nov 2021 as amended on 07 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN MINEHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY: PROVIDING ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA TO IMPROVE THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING , AND TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE; PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION AND MUTUAL SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS; GIVING PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS A VOICE, AND ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; RAISING AWARENESS IN THE COMMUNITY OF DEMENTIA BY GIVING TALKS, USING MEDIA COVERAGE AND BY OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION. ENGAGING WITH BUSINESSES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN AND AROUND MINEHEAD TO RAISE AWARENESS OF DEMENTIA AND TO SEEK THEIR SUPPORT. LIAISING WITH LOCAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROVIDERS, TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS, AND ENCOURAGING THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA; HELPING PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS TO ENGAGE EFFECTIVELY WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS; LIAISING WITH REGIONAL AND NATIONAL DEMENTIA CHARITIES TO ENSURE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA, AND THEIR CARERS, IN THE MINEHEAD AREA ARE MET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Lower Park
MINEHEAD
Somerset
TA24 8AY
- Phone:
- 01643 403054
- Email:
- secretary@mineheadda.org.uk
- Website:
-
MineheadDA.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window